MD HB98 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a specified temporary transferee of a tidal fish license from using the license or receiving a transfer of a license during a period of suspension under specified circumstances; altering the grounds for the suspension or revocation of a tidal fish license; altering the requirements for specified regulations adopted by the Department of Natural Resources relating to the suspension and revocation of a tidal fish license or authorization; etc.
Title
Department of Natural Resources - Tidal Fish Licenses - Transfer and Suspension
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-1) | |
2010-04-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-26 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-25 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-03 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2010-04-03 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-03-21 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-22 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-15 | First Reading Environmental Matters |