MD HB978 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 399
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 399
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, on or after July 1, 2021, pharmacy services administrative organizations to register with the Maryland Insurance Commissioner before providing certain services in the State; requiring certain applicants to file an application on a certain form and pay a certain fee; providing for the expiration and renewal of certain registration; prohibiting certain pharmacy services administrative organizations from entering into certain contracts; providing that a certain notice from the Commissioner constitutes a certain waiver; etc.
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations - Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 399 |
2020-03-18 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-18 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Floor Amendment {507773/1 (Senator Kramer) Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2020-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {566988/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB915 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 398
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Auditors and Audits
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Disclosure
Evidence
Examinations
Fees
Forms
Fraud
Health Insurance
Hearings
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Privacy
Public Information
Records
Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Auditors and Audits
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Disclosure
Evidence
Examinations
Fees
Forms
Fraud
Health Insurance
Hearings
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Privacy
Public Information
Records
Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Insurance | 15 | 2001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 2002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 2003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 2004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 2005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 2006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 2007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 2008 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 2009 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 2010 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 2011 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 2012 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 2013 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 2014 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 2015 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 2016 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 2017 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 2018 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 2019 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |