MD HB978 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Office of the Comptroller to collect a fee for a winery off-site permit and a wine festival permit; repealing a requirement that the Comptroller collect a fee for a winery special event permit; repealing provisions that provide for a winery special event permit; repealing provisions that provide for a farmer's market permit; establishing a winery off-site permit to be issued by the Comptroller; authorizing the Comptroller to issue a winery off-site permit to specified persons who meet specified requirements; etc.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Winery Off-Site Permit and Wine Festival Permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396 |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2013-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-20 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Morhaim) {343127/1 Adopted |
2013-03-18 | House | Special Order until 3/20 (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted |
2013-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {963092/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2013-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Agriculture
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore County
Calvert County
Carroll County
Comptroller
Fairs
Fees
Frederick County
Montgomery County
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Prince George's County
Records
Rules and Regulations
Transient Merchants
Agriculture
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore County
Calvert County
Carroll County
Comptroller
Fairs
Fees
Frederick County
Montgomery County
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Prince George's County
Records
Rules and Regulations
Transient Merchants