MD HB977 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Workgroup to Study Long-Term Care Medicaid Eligibility and Payments to Providers; providing for the composition, cochairs, and staffing of the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters; requiring the Workgroup to submit an interim and a final report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020, and June 30, 2021, respectively; etc.
Title
Workgroup to Study Long-Term Care Medicaid Eligibility and Payments to Providers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB981 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-17 - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Discrimination
Health, Department of
Legislation
Legislative Services, Department of
Long-Term Care
Medical Assistance
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Contracts
Discrimination
Health, Department of
Legislation
Legislative Services, Department of
Long-Term Care
Medical Assistance
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0977?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0977f.pdf |