MD HB976 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the annual salary of the State's Attorney of Prince George's County to $199,000; providing that the Act does not apply to the salary or compensation of the State's Attorney of Prince George's County while serving before October 1, 2014; providing that a specified limitation does not apply to a specified individual; etc.
Title
Prince George's County - State's Attorney - Salary PG 310-14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (124-5) (Y: 124 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (118-13) (Y: 118 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (118-13) (Y: 118 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245 |
2014-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (124-5) |
2014-04-07 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {628474/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (118-13) |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |