MD HB975 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-09 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-09 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program Fund for Nurses and Nursing Support Staff to assist certain nurses and nursing support staff with the repayment of certain education loans; establishing the Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Nurses and Nursing Support Staff; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to convene a certain stakeholder workgroup to make recommendations on the priorities for funding the repayment of education loans through the program; etc.
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment for Nurses and Nursing Support Staff - Program Establishment and Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-1) |
2022-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {953628/1 Adopted |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB696 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Subjects
Advertising
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Governor
Health Occupations
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Treasurers
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Governor
Health Occupations
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Treasurers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 24 | 1801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 1802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 1803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 1804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 1805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 1806 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |