MD HB975 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Public Service Commission; establishing a specified eligibility requirement for specified commissioners; providing that the Chairman shall serve at large; requiring the Governor to appoint four new commissioners; and providing that members of the Commission as of June 30, 2013, shall continue to serve the terms to which they were appointed.
Title
Public Service Commission - Membership
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] | Del. Sam Arora [D] | Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
Del. Anne Kaiser [D] | Del. Patrick McDonough [R] | Del. Nancy Stocksdale [R] | Del. John Wood [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2013-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |