MD HB971 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1132

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the placement and use of not more than one speed monitoring system at the intersection of Maryland Route 333 (Oxford Road) and Bonfield Avenue in Talbot County, subject to certain placement and signage requirements; requiring the fines collected by the Town of Oxford as a result of certain violations be used to assist in covering the cost of roadway and pedestrian safety improvements at a certain intersection; requiring a certain real-time display of a drivers traveling speed at a certain intersection; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Talbot County Speed Monitoring Systems

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23SenateHearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-03-22SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2021-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed (100-36)
2021-03-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {810713/1 Adopted
2021-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-02-25HouseHearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-05HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

HB1132 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation21809(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback