MD HB970 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Entering into the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact; stating the purpose of the Compact is to regulate the practice of telepsychology across state boundaries; establishing certain criteria and duties for compact states; requiring certain psychologists to hold a certain license from a home state and meet certain eligibility requirements to exercise certain authority to practice interjurisdictional telepsychology and certain temporary authority to practice in-person, face-to-face psychology in certain compact states; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01HouseReturned Passed
2021-03-31SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-03-30SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-18SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2021-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {536083/1 Adopted
2021-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2021-02-11HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-05HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB500 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Passed Enrolled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health Occupations183A-01(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback