MD HB97 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB915
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Workgroup on Black, Latino, Asian American Pacific Islander, and Other Underrepresented Behavioral Health Professionals; and requiring the Workgroup, on or before July 1, 2023, to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly.
Title
Workgroup on Black, Latino, Asian American Pacific Islander, and Other Underrepresented Behavioral Health Professionals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318 |
2022-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:15 p.m. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-02-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-6) |
2022-02-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-14 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-01-20 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 4:30 p.m. |
2022-01-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-19 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 4:00 p.m. |
2022-01-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-12 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2021-10-20 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB915 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Ethnic Affairs
Health Occupations
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minorities
Reports
Sunset
Ethnic Affairs
Health Occupations
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minorities
Reports
Sunset