MD HB97 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-15 - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-15 - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "item" as it relates to a certain prohibition against selling or displaying a certain obscene item to a minor by including a motion picture, an image, a visual representation, a video file, a video image, or a video recording; and expanding the definition of "image" to include a two-dimensional image, a three-dimensional image, and a holographic image.
Title
Criminal Law - Sale or Display of Obscene Item to Minor - Video Image
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-02-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {872619/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-01-18 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-18 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Minors
Nudity and Sexual Displays
Obscenity
Photography
Retail Sales
Video
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Minors
Nudity and Sexual Displays
Obscenity
Photography
Retail Sales
Video