MD HB97 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 591
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Continuing the State Board of Law Examiners in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2030, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; and requiring that an evaluation of the Board and the statutes and regulations that relate to the Board be performed on or before December 15, 2027.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Law Examiners – Sunset Extension

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 591
2018-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-14SenateHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-01SenateHearing canceled
2018-03-13SenateHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-19SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-02-16HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-02-14HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-02-14HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-02-12HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2018-01-24HouseHearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-12HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback