MD HB97 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Deputy Secretary of Behavioral Health and Disabilities in the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to develop a plan to integrate the provision of mental health and addiction treatment services and to convene a specified workgroup; providing for the membership of the workgroup; requiring the workgroup to make specified findings and recommendations; and requiring the workgroup to report to committees of the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2012.
Title
Behavioral Health - Integration of Mental Health and Addiction Treatment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/8 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-24 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Mental Health
Reports
Substance Abuse
Community Facilities and Services
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Mental Health
Reports
Substance Abuse
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB0097.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb0097f.pdf |