MD HB97 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-17 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-17 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the parent or legal guardian of a public school student to ensure that the student has been screened for hearing and vision problems before entering a public school system; requiring county boards of education to develop procedures to determine compliance with this requirement; etc.
Title
Education - Hearing and Vision Screenings
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Del. Robert Costa [R] | Del. Carolyn Krysiak [D] | Del. Tony McConkey [R] |
Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-17 | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-15 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0097.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0097f.pdf |