MD HB968 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a certification and regulatory scheme to certify dental assistants to perform certain intraoral procedures; specifying the intraoral procedures a dental assistant is authorized to perform without being certified by the State Board of Dental Examiners and the intraoral procedures that require certification; and authorizing the Board to penalize a licensed dentist who allows a dental assistant to provide dental care in an unauthorized manner or without required instruction or supervision.
Title
Health Occupations – Dental Assistants – Certification and Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (121-0) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {613829/1 Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2022-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {573328/1 Adopted |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB714 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-09 - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Dentists
Education
Electronic Communication
Examinations
Fees
Health Occupations
Job Training
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Photography
Rules and Regulations
Committees and Commissions
Dentists
Education
Electronic Communication
Examinations
Fees
Health Occupations
Job Training
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Photography
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 4 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 301.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 302.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 304.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 305.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 307.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 309.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 313.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 315 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |