MD HB968 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 378
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 378
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the maximum amounts of certain compensation awardable by the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board; authorizing the Board to negotiate a settlement with a person that has provided certain funeral or death-related services; altering the time within which a claimant is required to file a claim for compensation from the Board; authorizing a claimant to file a claim with the Board electronically in a certain manner; prohibiting certain persons from engaging in certain debt collection activities under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Compensation to Claimants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 378 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {862517/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Criminal Law - Procedure
Debt Collection
Electronic Government
Funerals
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Criminal Law - Procedure
Debt Collection
Electronic Government
Funerals
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices