MD HB968 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Public School Facility Construction Innovation Incentive Pilot Program to provide incentives to encourage public school systems to pursue innovative public school facility construction projects; requiring the Interagency Committee on School Construction to implement, administer, and promote the Program; requiring the Committee to approve a project that meets a certain cost threshold for participation in the Program; providing that a public school participant may use other types of financing or bidding; etc.
Title
Maryland School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-2) (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397 |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-2) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2018-04-06 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {654462/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 3:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Contracts
Counties
County Administrators
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Exemptions
General Assembly
Harford County
Prices
Primary and Secondary Education
Prince George's County
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Public Works, Board of
Rules and Regulations
Washington County
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Contracts
Counties
County Administrators
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Exemptions
General Assembly
Harford County
Prices
Primary and Secondary Education
Prince George's County
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Public Works, Board of
Rules and Regulations
Washington County