MD HB965 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB992
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from $10,000 to $15,000 the maximum amount of compensatory damages that may be awarded to an owner of a pet from a person who tortiously causes an injury to or death of the pet under certain circumstances.
Title
Civil Actions - Tortious Injury or Death of Pet - Compensatory Damages (Buddy's Law)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-4) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {743928/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB992 (Carry Over) 2020-02-07 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 11 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |