MD HB965 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Hearing: Mar 28 @ 1:00 pm Senate Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Baltimore City Board of License Commissioners to immediately suspend an alcoholic beverages license if it has reasonable cause to believe that the license holder has failed to take reasonable measures to prevent an act of violence that may result in death or serious bodily injury, or a recurrence of an act of violence that resulted in death or serious bodily injury, from occurring on the licensed premises or on certain property immediately adjacent to the licensed premises.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Grounds for Suspension

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {903891/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback