MD HB965 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the applicability of specified security breach investigation and notification requirements to specified businesses; authorizing a specified business to elect to provide a specified notification; prohibiting a specified business from charging a specified business a fee for providing information needed to provide a specified notification or requiring or compelling a specified business to make a specified election; prohibiting a specified business from using specified information for specified purposes; etc.
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2017-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {633593/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Cybersecurity
Data
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Communication
Federal Government
Fees
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Notices
Privacy
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Cybersecurity
Data
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Communication
Federal Government
Fees
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Notices
Privacy