MD HB965 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 727
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 727
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland International thoroughbred race; providing that the Maryland International is a Grade 1 stakes race run on a turf track; providing for the funding of the purse for the Maryland International beginning on July 1, 2017; providing that money from the State Lottery Fund be distributed as part of a bonus award program for Maryland-bred or-sired horses running in the Preakness Stakes in fiscal year 2017; providing that specified funds from the State Lottery Fund be distributed to pay for specified sporting events; etc.
Title
The Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentive Act of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 727 |
2016-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-04-11 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {273228/2 Adopted |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {657877/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {295668/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Advertising
Animals
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Fees
Horse Racing
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Racing
Revenue and Taxes
Stadium Authority
Sunset
Animals
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Fees
Horse Racing
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Racing
Revenue and Taxes
Stadium Authority
Sunset