MD HB965 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-04 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-04 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "legal interest" to include an interest in a dwelling as a settlor, grantor, or beneficiary of a trust under specified circumstances, so as to include specified settlors, grantors, or beneficiaries of trusts as eligible to apply for the homestead property tax credit.
Title
Homestead Tax Credit - Eligibility - Definition of Legal Interest
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2013-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {825262/2 Report Adopted |
2013-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2013-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |