MD HB963 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a certain inmate who has been convicted of a certain violent crime committed on or after October 1, 2018, from being eligible for parole until the inmate has served a certain portion of a certain sentence under certain circumstances; requiring a certain inmate who has been convicted of a certain violent crime committed on or after October 1, 2018, to receive an administrative review of the inmate's progress in the correctional facility after the inmate has served a certain part of a certain sentence; etc.
Title
Correctional Services - Eligibility for Parole - Violent Crime
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Prisoners
Public Safety
Violence
Criminal Law - Procedure
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Prisoners
Public Safety
Violence