MD HB963 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 725
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 725
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering specified campaign finance law definitions to include campaign finance activity relating to prospective questions to be placed on the ballot; prohibiting a chief election official from certifying a petition if the petition sponsor fails to provide proof of filing a specified campaign finance report; repealing specified requirements that a statement of contributions and expenditures for a petition be filed at the time the petition is filed; etc.
Title
Campaign Finance - Ballot Issue Committees - Prospective Questions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-38) (Y: 98 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-41) (Y: 93 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-41) (Y: 93 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 725 |
2016-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-38) |
2016-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {904635/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-41) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {475764/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Ballots
Campaign Financing
Committees and Commissions
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Gifts
Petitions
Reports
Signatures
Campaign Financing
Committees and Commissions
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Gifts
Petitions
Reports
Signatures