MD HB963 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-7)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-7)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring hospitals that provide emergency medical services to have, on or before July 1, 2014, a protocol to provide timely access to sexual assault medical forensic examinations by forensic nurse examiners or physicians to specified victims; establishing the Planning Committee to Implement Improved Access to Sexual Assault Medical Forensic Examinations in Maryland; etc.
Title
Hospitals - Protocol for Sexual Assault Medical Forensic Examinations and Planning Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627 |
2014-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {893229/1 Rejected |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {296181/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Emergency Medical Services
Evidence
Examinations
Health
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospitals
Nurses
Physicians
Public Health
Reports
Sexual Offenses
Sunset
Victims
Emergency Medical Services
Evidence
Examinations
Health
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospitals
Nurses
Physicians
Public Health
Reports
Sexual Offenses
Sunset
Victims