MD HB96 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB762

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring public high school students, beginning in the 2022-2023 school year, as a requirement for graduation, to submit the Free Application for Federal Student Aid (FAFSA) to the U.S. Department of Education or the Maryland State Financial Aid Application (MSFAA) to the Maryland Higher Education Commission; authorizing a student or the parent or legal guardian of a minor student to submit to a county board of education a statement that the student understands the FAFSA or MSFAA and declines to complete and submit the application; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - High School Graduation Requirements - Application

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2020-10-30HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB762 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education7205.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback