MD HB96 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "mother" so as to deny inclusion of a gamete donor unless the gamete donor and the child's mother agree in writing that the gamete donor will be a parent of the child, or at the time of the child's conception or birth, the gamete donor is married to the child's mother.
Title
Family Law - Parentage and Adoption - Definitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-02-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-18 | House | Motion Special Order until 2/19 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {672419/1 Adopted |
2020-02-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2020-01-14 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 5 | 1001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |