MD HB96 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 36
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for up to $7,500 of qualified expenses paid or incurred by a living individual that are attributable to the donation of certain organs for organ transplantation; defining "organ" and "qualified expenses"; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Living Organ Donors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 36
2018-03-27HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-26SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-23SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-23SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-23SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-22SenateHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-23SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2018-02-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-20HouseFloor Amendment {323320/1 (Delegate Rey) Adopted
2018-02-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {545564/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-19HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-06HouseHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-12HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0096&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0096f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0096t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_36_hb0096t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0096_32332001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0096_54556401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0006/hb0096.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0096_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0120.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0096_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0814.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback