MD HB959 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to enforce certain provisions of law under certain applicable powers; requiring the Commissioner to adopt certain regulations under certain circumstances that are consistent with certain federal regulations, rules, and guidance; prohibiting certain carriers from excluding or limiting certain benefits or denying certain coverage because a certain health condition was present on a certain date; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Consumer Protections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 110 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 110 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620 |
2020-03-16 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-14) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (110-28) |
2020-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {556485/1 Adopted |
2020-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB872 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 621
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Advertising
Age
Attorney General
Commerce and Business
Commission on Civil Rights
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Disclosure
Discrimination
Drugs
Emergency Bills
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Ethics
Examinations
Federal Government
Fees
Health
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Immunization
Industry and Technology
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Investigations and Inquiries
Labeling
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Public Information
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Solicitation
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth
Advertising
Age
Attorney General
Commerce and Business
Commission on Civil Rights
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Disclosure
Discrimination
Drugs
Emergency Bills
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Ethics
Examinations
Federal Government
Fees
Health
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Immunization
Industry and Technology
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Investigations and Inquiries
Labeling
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Public Information
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Solicitation
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Insurance | 15 | 137.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15-1A | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15-1A | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15-1A | 11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15-1A | 12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15-1A | 13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15-1A | 14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15-1A | 15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15-1A | 16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15-1A | 17 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15-1A | 18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15-1A | 19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15-1A | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15-1A | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15-1A | 21 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15-1A | 22 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15-1A | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15-1A | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15-1A | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15-1A | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15-1A | 7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15-1A | 8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15-1A | 9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |