MD HB959 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to participate in a specified database; altering the authority of the Commissioner to allow a commercial insured to waive specified search requirements for surplus lines coverage for specified purposes; authorizing a surplus lines broker to not perform a diligent search when placing specified coverage with an exempt commercial purchaser under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Insurance - Surplus Lines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2011-03-25 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-24 | First Reading Finance | |
2011-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2011-03-20 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-02-14 | Hearing 3/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Federal Government
Fees
Forms
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Prices
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Federal Government
Fees
Forms
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Prices
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations