MD HB956 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a retail service station to have an attendant available to process cash payments from customers for the purchase of motor fuel during the retail service station's hours of operation.
Title
Business Regulation - Motor Fuel Retail Service Station - Attendant Required
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2017-02-28 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |