MD HB95 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB702
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-12 - Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-12 - Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that training materials used by the program of instruction for election judges include oral and written instruction in the various methods an election judge may use to assist or accommodate elderly and disabled voters in voting; and establishing requirements for the development and placement of signage that states the specific methods election judges may use to assist or accommodate elderly and disabled voters in voting at a specific polling place.
Title
Election Judges - Training and Signs - Accommodations for Voters in Need of Assistance
Sponsors
Del. Terri Hill [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-12 | House | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2022-11-15 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB702 (Carry Over) 2022-02-02 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
accessibility
Disabilities
Elderly Persons
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Job Training
Notices
Signs and Billboards
Voting
Disabilities
Elderly Persons
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Job Training
Notices
Signs and Billboards
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 10 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 10 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0095?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/hb/hb0095f.pdf |