MD HB95 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Montgomery County Board of License Commissioners by unanimous vote to approve an application for a Class B beer, wine and liquor license for a restaurant located in the City of Gaithersburg in Montgomery County that meets specified other requirements; and specifying that the Class B beer, wine and liquor license authorizes the license holder to keep for sale and sell alcoholic beverages for consumption on the premises only.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Gaithersburg - Licensed Alcoholic Beverages Restaurants - Distance from Churches or Other Places of Worship MC 23-15

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-14HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 66
2015-04-10HouseReturned Passed
2015-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2015-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2015-04-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2015-04-08SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2015-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-03-06SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2015-03-05HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2015-03-03HouseSecond Reading Passed
2015-03-03HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2015-03-02HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2015-02-23HouseHearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-01-23HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback