MD HB95 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to develop and make available for specified vehicles a registration plate honoring the armed forces of the United States; requiring that fees charged for the plates be used only for specified purposes; requiring a registration plate issued under the Act to contain a specified graphic design and specified words; requiring the Administration to adopt regulations to carry out the provisions of the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plate - United States Armed Forces

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-24HouseUnfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
2014-01-28HouseHearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-01-08HouseFirst Reading Environmental Matters
2013-10-17HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback