MD HB95 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of the Environment to comply with specified public participation requirements prior to the issuance of an ambient air quality control permit for a source that is subject to federal New Source Performance Standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment - Permits - New Source Performance Standards

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-16HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 608
2013-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2013-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2013-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2013-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2013-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2013-03-26SenateHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-03-21SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2013-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2013-03-19HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments {200511/1 Report Adopted
2013-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2013-02-06HouseHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-01-15HouseFirst Reading Environmental Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0095&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2013rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb0095f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb0095t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/Chapters_noln/CH_608_hb0095t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0095_20051101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb0095.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb0095_env.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb0095_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0095,h-0476&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0095,s-1101&stab=02&ys=2013RS

Bill Comments

feedback