MD HB95 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering requirements relating to the registration of individuals who have committed specified sex offenses to include three tier levels of offenses; providing that specified registration requirements are to be applied retroactively under specified circumstances; requiring persons to register on a specified registry if they have been convicted of specified crimes in specified countries; altering specified requirements for a person under the age of 18 at the time the person commits a sex offense to register under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sex Offenders - Notification and Registration
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-22 | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn | |
2010-02-18 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-29 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-15 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-15 | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-15 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Abduction
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Ex-Offenders
Genetics
Identification
Indigent Persons
International Affairs
Interstate Affairs
Law Enforcement
Minors
Murder
Notices
Pornography
Privacy
Private Schools
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Public Schools
Records
Registration
Reports
Sexual Offenses
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Ex-Offenders
Genetics
Identification
Indigent Persons
International Affairs
Interstate Affairs
Law Enforcement
Minors
Murder
Notices
Pornography
Privacy
Private Schools
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Public Schools
Records
Registration
Reports
Sexual Offenses
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0095.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0095f.pdf |