MD HB949 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Provision of Health Care Coverage to Uninsured Marylanders; providing for the composition, chair, staffing, and duties of the Task Force; establishing the purpose of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to submit a final report on its recommendations and finding to the Senate Finance Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee on or before January 1, 2017; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study the Provision of Health Care Coverage to Uninsured Marylanders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2015-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Health Insurance
Insurance - Health
Medical Assistance
Public Health
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Health Insurance
Insurance - Health
Medical Assistance
Public Health
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset