MD HB948 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting from certain real property recordation, transfer, and excise taxes and certificate of title fees certain transfers of real property and certain vehicles from a revocable trust to a beneficiary of the trust as a result of the death of the settlor of the revocable trust.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Estates and Trusts – Transfer From Revocable Trust – Exemption From Taxes and Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 316
2018-04-02HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-30SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-29SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-29SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-20SenateReassigned to Budget and Taxation
2018-03-15SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {826584/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-02-28HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback