MD HB947 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Division of Correction within the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to establish a certain transitional work release program for qualified inmates and to adopt certain regulations; establishing the qualifications for participation in a certain transitional work release program; authorizing the Division to conduct certain drug tests, require certain monitoring by a global positioning system device, and to deduct certain wages from a certain program participant for certain purposes; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional Services - Female Inmate Serving Life Term - Transitional Work Release Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06HouseUnfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
2019-03-01HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback