MD HB945 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to notify in writing at specified times an owner of a vehicle registered in the State of any restriction placed on the vehicle's registration and the reason for the placement of the restriction; requiring the Administration to notify immediately in writing an owner of a vehicle registered in the State of any rescission of a restriction on the vehicle's registration; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Restrictions
Sponsors
Del. Barbara Frush [D] | Del. Anne Healey [D] | Del. James Hubbard [D] | Del. Patrick McDonough [R] |
Sen. Barbara Robinson [D] | Del. Theodore Sophocleus [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn | |
2012-03-08 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-13 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB0945.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb0945f.pdf |