MD HB942 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from possessing or using an electronic control device unless the person has been issued a specified permit; prohibiting the sale or activation of an electronic control device in the State unless the purchaser provides valid proof to the seller that the purchaser has successfully completed an electronic control device training program approved by the Maryland Police and Correctional Training Commission; defining the term "electronic control device"; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Electronic Control Devices - Training Program and Permit
Sponsors
Del. Susan Aumann [R] | Sen. Gail Bates [R] | Del. Joseph Boteler [R] | Sen. Adelaide Eckardt [R] |
Del. William Frank [R] | Del. Jeannie Haddaway-Riccio [D] | Del. Adrienne Jones [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn | |
2010-02-25 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-15 | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-12 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Appeals
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Officers
Criminal Background Investigations
Dealers
Education
Fees
Judicial Review
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
State Police, Department of
Weapons
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Officers
Criminal Background Investigations
Dealers
Education
Fees
Judicial Review
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
State Police, Department of
Weapons
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0942.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0942f.pdf |