MD HB941 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Department of Education to administer the Child Care Subsidy Program in accordance with federal law; establishing eligibility criteria to continue to receive a certain subsidy for at least 90 days in a year if the individual is unemployed and seeking employment and if the individual meets certain other eligibility requirements; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Care Subsidy Program – Unemployment – Eligibility

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 396
2018-04-05HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-04-05HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2018-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-30SenateFavorable with Amendments {609035/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-30SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-23SenateReassigned to Budget and Taxation
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {194164/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-02-27HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0941&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0941f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0941t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0941e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_396_hb0941e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0941_19416401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0941_60903501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0001/hb0941.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0941_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0650.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0941_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1026.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1098.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback