MD HB941 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified fines to be remitted to the Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund; establishing the Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund; providing for the uses, purposes, sources of funding, investment of money, and auditing of the Fund; requiring the Executive Director of the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention (GOCCP) to administer the Fund; providing that the Fund is a continuing, nonlapsing fund not subject to specified provisions of law; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-7) (Y: 132 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-7) (Y: 132 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410 |
2017-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-7) |
2017-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {274162/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2017-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Abuse
Animals
Clerks of Court
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
District Courts
Fines
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Animals
Clerks of Court
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
District Courts
Fines
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset