MD HB94 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a nonprofit institution of higher education to deposit specified available institutional funds into the research endowment of the institution under specified circumstances to satisfy a specified 90-day deposit requirement to receive matching funds under the Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program.
Title
Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Requirements for Matching Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258 |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2017-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-01-16 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Appropriations
Economic and Community Development
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Nonprofit Organizations
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Time
Economic and Community Development
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Nonprofit Organizations
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Time