MD HB939 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 379
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 379
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a dental practice to be owned by a licensed dentist or a dental professional corporation; establishing that only a certain individual licensed by the State Board of Dental Examiners may take certain actions; prohibiting any person who is not a licensed dentist to direct, control, or interfere with the independent professional judgement of a dentist or dental hygienist regarding the care of a certain patient; prohibiting a licensed dentist from sharing revenues or splitting fees except under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Practice of Dentistry - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 379 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2020-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {916982/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB174 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 380
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Corporations
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Fees
Health Occupations
Job Training
Judgments
Licenses
Limited Liability Companies
Patients
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Work, Labor and Employment
Contracts
Corporations
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Fees
Health Occupations
Job Training
Judgments
Licenses
Limited Liability Companies
Patients
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 4 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 315 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |