MD HB934 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 788
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 788
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the circumstances under which a person in interest may appeal to the Secretary of Health the denial by the Chief Medical Examiner to correct certain findings and conclusions recorded on a certificate of death; and requiring the Maryland Department of Health to report to certain committees of the General Assembly by October 1, 2024, on the number of appeals made to the Secretary when the Chief Medical Examiner denied a request to correct findings and conclusions on the cause and manner of death after October 1, 2021.
Title
Public Health – Chief Medical Examiner – Autopsy Findings and Conclusions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 788 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2021-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-1) |
2021-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {376883/1 Adopted |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Appeals
Autopsies
Communications
Death
Examinations
Health
Health, Department of
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Medical Examiners
Public Health
Records
Reports
Vital Records
Autopsies
Communications
Death
Examinations
Health
Health, Department of
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Medical Examiners
Public Health
Records
Reports
Vital Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 5 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |