MD HB930 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain requirements regarding the location of land that may be acquired by the State under the Senator William H. Amoss Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Fund; and authorizing the use of the Fund for certain construction.
Title
Senator William H. Amoss Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Property Acquisition and Construction of Facilities
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421 |
2022-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2022-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Ambulances
Boundaries
Construction
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Safety
Real Property
Rescue Squads
Revenue and Taxes
Boundaries
Construction
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Safety
Real Property
Rescue Squads
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 8 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |