MD HB93 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 48
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring, except under certain circumstances, certain lenders to serve on the borrower at least 30 days before a lender repossesses mobile home a written notice of the lender's intention to repossess a certain mobile home; providing that a mobile home retailer has a duty of good faith and fair dealing in providing financial information to a prospective consumer borrower; prohibiting a mobile home retailer from steering a prospective consumer borrower to certain financing products; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 48
2020-03-16HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-02-21SenateReferred Finance
2020-02-20HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2020-02-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {733697/1 Adopted
2020-02-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-01-24HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-13HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB155 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 49

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Commercial Law121001(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law12101(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law121021(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law12115(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law12901(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law12921(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law144201(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law144202(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law144203(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law144204(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law144205(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11501(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11601(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11610(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback