MD HB93 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - House Requests Senate Recede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - House Requests Senate Recede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a court to order a defendant convicted of a specified charge of animal cruelty, as a condition of sentencing, to pay, in addition to any other fines and costs, all reasonable costs, not to exceed $15,000, incurred in removing, housing, treating, euthanizing, or disposing of an animal confiscated from the defendant, except under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2014-04-07 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {798976/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {902813/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2014-01-23 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m. |
2014-01-15 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-01-23 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2013-09-25 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Abuse
Animals
Birds
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Fines
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Animals
Birds
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Fines
Notices
Penalties and Sentences