MD HB923 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Declaring the intent of the General Assembly that homeowners have access to certain affordability programs for water and sewer services; authorizing a political subdivision, a sanitary commission, or an authority to develop and implement certain affordability programs; authorizing a sanitary commission, a political subdivision, or an authority to disconnect certain service to properties that meet certain criteria; etc.
Title
Environment – Water and Sewer Service
Sponsors
Del. Jay Walker [D] | Sen. Johnny Mautz [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182 |
2018-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {460911/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Assessments
Boundaries
Committees and Commissions
Environment
Fees
General Assembly
Housing
Notices
Prices
Real Property
Sewage
Water
Boundaries
Committees and Commissions
Environment
Fees
General Assembly
Housing
Notices
Prices
Real Property
Sewage
Water